TN SB0505 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits expunction of certain nonviolent felonies after 10 years have elapsed since the completion of the sentence imposed for the most recent offense. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, permits expunction of certain nonviolent felonies after 10 years have elapsed since the completion of the sentence imposed for the most recent offense. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0587 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee