TN SB0501 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits interpreting or amending county charter in a manner inconsistent with state law with respect to the duties, qualifications, and privileges of the constitutional county offices of sheriff, register, county clerk, assessor of property, or trustee. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits interpreting or amending county charter in a manner inconsistent with state law with respect to the duties, qualifications, and privileges of the constitutional county offices of sheriff, register, county clerk, assessor of property, or trustee. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 458
2019-04-29SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/29/19
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-17SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-09SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1423 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 458
HB0346 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback