TN SB0499 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides a student enrolled at an institution of higher education or student organization officially recognized by an institution of higher education with a right to representation by an attorney or non-attorney advocate at the student or organization’s expense; prohibits the student or student organization from the right to representation if the institution has a student honor court or in instances of academic dishonesty; requires institutions of higher education to provide an annual report about the number and type of disciplinary hearings as well as the number of students represented by an attorney or non-attorney advocate. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
As introduced, provides a student enrolled at an institution of higher education or student organization officially recognized by an institution of higher education with a right to representation by an attorney or non-attorney advocate at the student or organization’s expense; prohibits the student or student organization from the right to representation if the institution has a student honor court or in instances of academic dishonesty; requires institutions of higher education to provide an annual report about the number and type of disciplinary hearings as well as the number of students represented by an attorney or non-attorney advocate. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0517 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2018