TN SB0498 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires secretary of state to provide an applicant to conduct an annual charitable gaming event with written notice by certified mail upon exclusion of the event application from the omnibus list of approved applications. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3, Chapter 17, relative to charitable gaming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. 4/13/21 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0611 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.