TN SB0490 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides a method for a property owner to seek just compensation for a diminution in value of the property caused by the enactment or enforcement of land use regulations on the property. - Amends TCA Title 29.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, relative to compensation for the diminution in value of private property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-25SenateSponsor change.
2023-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0560 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback