TN SB0490 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, rewrites charter. - Amends Chapter 186 of the Acts of 1901; as amended and rewritten.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 186 of the Acts of 1901; as amended and rewritten by Chapter 112 of the Private Acts of 1991; Chapter 53 of the Private Acts of 1993, Chapter 12 of the Private Acts of 2017; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter of the Town of Carthage.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 28 | |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1609 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 28