TN SB0490 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that an applicant shall be deemed by the Tennessee regulatory authority to have satisfied all of the requirements necessary for approval of a state-issued certificate of franchise authority if the applicant has provided fiber-to-the-premises to at least 1,000 customers for a period of at least one year prior to the application. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, specifies that an applicant shall be deemed by the Tennessee regulatory authority to have satisfied all of the requirements necessary for approval of a state-issued certificate of franchise authority if the applicant has provided fiber-to-the-premises to at least 1,000 customers for a period of at least one year prior to the application. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0820 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee