TN SB0489 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts "The Small Estate Probate Act," makes various changes to "The Small Estate Affidavit Limited Letter of Authority Act" and replaces that act. - Amends TCA Title 30, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 30, Chapter 4, relative to small estates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 297
2023-04-06SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-06SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2023-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/6/2023
2023-03-29SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2023-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2023
2023-03-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2023
2023-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023
2023-03-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023
2023-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023
2023-03-21SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-25SenateSponsor change.
2023-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0337 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback