TN SB0489 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes municipalities operating an electric plant to provide telecommunication services, including broadband internet access, in geographical areas both within and outside of the electric plant's service area. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes municipalities operating an electric plant to provide telecommunication services, including broadband internet access, in geographical areas both within and outside of the electric plant's service area. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0821 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback