TN SB0489 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Kenneth and Madge Tullis, MD, Suicide Prevention Training Act." - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Kenneth and Madge Tullis, MD, Suicide Prevention Training Act." - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 396 | |
2017-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2017 | |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0365) |
2017-05-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0315) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0948 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 396