TN SB0488 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts enhanced handgun carry permit holders from the prohibition against carrying a weapon on property that has been posted to prohibit possession of weapons on the premises; removes criminal penalty of Class B misdemeanor punishable only by $500 fine for carrying a weapon on posted property. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1359.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 39-17-1359, relative to firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-03SenateWithdrawn.
2023-02-03SenateRecalled from Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-25SenateSponsor change.
2023-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0192 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-30 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback