TN SB0483 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 04/04/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 04/04/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes provisions that allow parties in certain civil cases to agree to employ a retired or former judge to hear the case and provide for the process and manner of trial. - Amends TCA Title 17, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 17, Chapter 2, Part 1, relative to special judges.
Sponsors
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Effective date(s) 04/04/2023 | |
2023-04-18 | Pub. Ch. 118 | |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-03-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-03-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2023 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0418 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 118