TN SB0482 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a local board of education to make payroll deduction for dues of professional employees' organizations available to its professional employees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a local board of education to make payroll deduction for dues of professional employees' organizations available to its professional employees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/29/19 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0564 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-29 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee