TN SB0481 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends provisions related to the apportionment and distribution of state tax revenue as they pertain to National Hockey League franchises until June 30, 2049. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Effective date(s) 05/27/2021 | |
2021-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 591 | |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 75, Nays 4, PNV 4 |
2021-05-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0157 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 591