TN SB0480 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 298
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 298
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies various provisions of the ignition interlock requirements for certain DUI offenders. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 29; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 55; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, clarifies various provisions of the ignition interlock requirements for certain DUI offenders. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 29; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 55; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 298 | |
2011-05-12 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-02-14 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0140 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 298