TN SB0479 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that semester hours earned in ROTC courses by ROTC students do not count toward the semester hour limitation for receipt of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship; excludes grades received in ROTC courses from the calculation of an ROTC student's grade point average for Tennessee HOPE scholarship purposes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, specifies that semester hours earned in ROTC courses by ROTC students do not count toward the semester hour limitation for receipt of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship; excludes grades received in ROTC courses from the calculation of an ROTC student's grade point average for Tennessee HOPE scholarship purposes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0510 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee