TN SB0475 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes confidential, from April 28, 2021, to July 1, 2026, certain personal, financial, and residential information of federal law enforcement agents and officers conducting operations in this state in the same manner that such information is confidential for state and local law enforcement officers and agents. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38 and Title 39, relative to confidential information of law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective date(s) 4/28/2021 | |
2021-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 253 | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0104) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0347 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 253