TN SB0474 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Business Fairness Act," allowing businesses that comply with safety precautions and guidelines issued by the government or authorized agency during declared states of emergency to continue or resume business. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, Chapter 2, relative to the continuation of business during states of emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-04-30 | Pub. Ch. 155 | |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0855 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 155