TN SB0474 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Annual Coverage Assessment Act of 2019." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5 and Chapter 888 of the Public Acts of 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Annual Coverage Assessment Act of 2019." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5 and Chapter 888 of the Public Acts of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 434
2019-04-30SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0771 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 434

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback