TN SB0469 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a homeowners' association from adopting or enforcing a dedicatory instrument provision that prohibits, or has the effect of prohibiting, a property owner from displaying the flag of the United States of America or an official or replica flag of any branch of the United States armed forces on the property owner's property; allows certain restrictions regarding display. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 66.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a homeowners' association from adopting or enforcing a dedicatory instrument provision that prohibits, or has the effect of prohibiting, a property owner from displaying the flag of the United States of America or an official or replica flag of any branch of the United States armed forces on the property owner's property; allows certain restrictions regarding display. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 66.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 331 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0160) |
2017-05-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-06 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0231) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0456 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 331