TN SB0468 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires courts to require any person who is, on or after July 1, 2017, placed on probation for an offense that would qualify the person as a child rapist or child sexual predator and who does not maintain either a primary or secondary residence, to enroll in a satellite-based monitoring and supervision program for the full extent of the person's term of probation. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39.
Title
As enacted, requires courts to require any person who is, on or after July 1, 2017, placed on probation for an offense that would qualify the person as a child rapist or child sexual predator and who does not maintain either a primary or secondary residence, to enroll in a satellite-based monitoring and supervision program for the full extent of the person's term of probation. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 311 | |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0404 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 311