TN SB0467 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 502
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 502
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, instead of authorizes, the government operations committees to review every rule promulgated pursuant to the UAPA; makes other various changes to the rulemaking process under the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, requires, instead of authorizes, the government operations committees to review every rule promulgated pursuant to the UAPA; makes other various changes to the rulemaking process under the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 502 | |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0216 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 502