TN SB0466 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Ocoee River Recreation and Economic Development Fund Act". - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11 and Title 64.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Ocoee River Recreation and Economic Development Fund Act". - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11 and Title 64.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 434 | |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0074 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 434