TN SB0459 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the bureau to establish, by January 1, 2024, a statewide program of all-inclusive care for the elderly (PACE) to provide comprehensive, integrated acute and long-term care services for qualifying frail, elderly individuals who require nursing facility levels of care; sets minimum program enrollment limits; authorizes the director to seek any federal waiver the director deems necessary to establish the program. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, relative to TennCare.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Health and Welfare Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0416 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee