TN SB0457 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, in jurisdictions that conduct citizen police academies or similar programs, that members of a community oversight board complete the local police force's citizen academy course or program; establishes timeframe for completion and provides that noncompliant member will lose voting privileges until requirement is met. - Amends TCA Title 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, relative to law enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 523 | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0374 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021