TN SB0457 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that reports of findings and recommendations by the elevator and amusement device safety board on technical issues be transmitted to the commissioner of labor and workforce development for final disposition within 10 business days of the completion of such reports. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 62 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, specifies that reports of findings and recommendations by the elevator and amusement device safety board on technical issues be transmitted to the commissioner of labor and workforce development for final disposition within 10 business days of the completion of such reports. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 62 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0805 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee