TN SB0456 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits law enforcement from entering private property for the purpose of engaging in surveillance or setting up surveillance equipment to search for and collect evidence or obtain information or other data unless the officer has obtained a search warrant or a judicially recognized exception to the warrant requirement exists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to surveillance of private property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/13/2021
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-17SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/23/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0043 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback