TN SB0456 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing identifying the person who makes service of process. - Amends TCA Section 16-15-901.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing identifying the person who makes service of process. - Amends TCA Section 16-15-901.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Pub. Ch. 196
2019-05-01 Effective date(s) 01/01/2020
2019-04-25SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-18SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-17SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-17SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-15HousePassed H., Ayes 88, Nays 6, PNV 0
2019-04-15HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0267)
2019-04-15HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-14SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-03-14SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0065)
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2019
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-12SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/26/2019
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0393 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 196

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback