TN SB0456 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for re-establishment of elected office of school superintendent for counties or cities upon two-thirds vote of governing body; any such ordinance or resolution once approved is not operative until approved in an election; provides for qualifications of candidates. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-203 and Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, provides for re-establishment of elected office of school superintendent for counties or cities upon two-thirds vote of governing body; any such ordinance or resolution once approved is not operative until approved in an election; provides for qualifications of candidates. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-203 and Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-04-18 | Recalled from S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0456&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0456.pdf |