TN SB0454 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides for reimbursement to the wildlife resources agency for lost revenue resulting from the issuance of free or partially discounted combination hunting and fishing licenses created by statute on or after January 1, 2017. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3 and Title 70.
Title
As enacted, provides for reimbursement to the wildlife resources agency for lost revenue resulting from the issuance of free or partially discounted combination hunting and fishing licenses created by statute on or after January 1, 2017. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 330 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 05/09/2017 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0129) |
2017-05-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0400) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0207) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0468 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 330