TN SB0451 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, expands the offense of aggravated rioting to include rioting by a person who travels from outside the state with intent to commit a criminal offense and participating in a riot in exchange for compensation; increases the mandatory minimum sentence for aggravated rioting to 60 days if the person commits more than one aggravating circumstance. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to rioting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-28SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-04-27HousePassed H., Ayes 73, Nays 20, PNV 0
2021-04-27HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0039)
2021-04-27HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-15HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-03-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-11SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 5, PNV 1
2021-03-11SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0027)
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/11/2021
2021-03-02SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
2021-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/2/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0881 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-27 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback