TN SB0451 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes electronic transmission of any report required to be sent to the chief clerks of the house of representatives and the senate by the board of judicial conduct. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17.
Title
As introduced, authorizes electronic transmission of any report required to be sent to the chief clerks of the house of representatives and the senate by the board of judicial conduct. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0218 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-31 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.