TN SB0450 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, deletes restriction on size of grant the department is authorized to make to the Tennessee sheriffs' association from statewide automated victim information and notification system fund for management of system; corrects language regarding deposits into such fund. - Amends TCA Section 40-38-505 and Section 67-4-602.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, deletes restriction on size of grant the department is authorized to make to the Tennessee sheriffs' association from statewide automated victim information and notification system fund for management of system; corrects language regarding deposits into such fund. - Amends TCA Section 40-38-505 and Section 67-4-602.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-17HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-17HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-04HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-02SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-01SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/1/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0331 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback