TN SB0448 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes any state agency, department, board, bureau, commission, or authority to which an individual owes a debt or that acts on behalf of an individual to collect a debt to submit to the Tennessee education lottery corporation a list of the names of all persons owing debts in excess of $75, instead of $100, for the purposes of collecting such debt from any lottery winnings. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51, Part 2; Title 9; Title 45; Title 47; Title 62; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 51, Part 2; Title 9; Title 45; Title 47; Title 62; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to debt.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0617 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback