TN SB0448 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a preference and rebuttable presumption for joint custody or shared parenting, but gives the court wide discretion to order a custody arrangement in the child's best interest; requires the court to include findings of fact and conclusions of law to the contrary in any custody order that does not include joint custody. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, establishes a preference and rebuttable presumption for joint custody or shared parenting, but gives the court wide discretion to order a custody arrangement in the child's best interest; requires the court to include findings of fact and conclusions of law to the contrary in any custody order that does not include joint custody. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0448&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB0448.pdf |