TN SB0448 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the board of podiatric medical examiners to establish a registration process for certain residents continuing their clinical education; authorizes a licensed orthotist or prosthetist to utilize one or more non-licensed persons to assist in the performance of minor repairs on devices that have been previously dispensed to patients and the performance of other tasks approved by the board. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, requires the board of podiatric medical examiners to establish a registration process for certain residents continuing their clinical education; authorizes a licensed orthotist or prosthetist to utilize one or more non-licensed persons to assist in the performance of minor repairs on devices that have been previously dispensed to patients and the performance of other tasks approved by the board. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 167 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2017-04-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0297) |
2017-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-03 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0181) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1090 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 167