TN SB0447 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a victims of human trafficking fund in the state treasury to provide comprehensive treatment and support services to victims of human trafficking. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 2; Section 39-13-314 and Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 7.
Title
As enacted, establishes a victims of human trafficking fund in the state treasury to provide comprehensive treatment and support services to victims of human trafficking. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 2; Section 39-13-314 and Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] |
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 356 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0446) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0446) |
2019-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0277) |
2019-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0163) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0397 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 356