TN SB0446 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the definition of "eligible postsecondary institution" to include certain private postsecondary institutions for purposes of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9, relative to state lottery proceeds.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to first calendar of 2022 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Ed. Comm. 4/6/21 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0711 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - No Action Taken