TN SB0444 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of revenue to report to the fiscal review committee and transportation committees on the actual or estimated number of passenger motor vehicles that have been issued stickers or decals to use the HOV lane. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-188.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of revenue to report to the fiscal review committee and transportation committees on the actual or estimated number of passenger motor vehicles that have been issued stickers or decals to use the HOV lane. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-188.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/19/18 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0446 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-24 - Held on desk.