TN SB0443 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that statewide assessment scores used in the calculation of students' final course grade be returned to districts at least five instructional days before the end of the course. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-617.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires that statewide assessment scores used in the calculation of students' final course grade be returned to districts at least five instructional days before the end of the course. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-617.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019
2019-03-12SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
2019-02-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/13/2019
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/20/2019
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0315 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/26/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback