TN SB0442 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the Class E felony of possessing a telecommunication device inside a penal institution; specifies that the first violation of such an offense is punishable only by a fine and the second or subsequent violation is punishable only by a fine of $3,000. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 2, relative to contraband in a penal institution.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 236 | |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1343 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 7/1/2021