TN SB0438 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a rebuttable presumption that a firefighter's cancer that causes a disabling health condition is a result of the firefighter's duties as a firefighter. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a rebuttable presumption that a firefighter's cancer that causes a disabling health condition is a result of the firefighter's duties as a firefighter. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0519 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback