TN SB0438 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Govt Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Govt Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds costs of certain printing equipment to current list of costs for which municipal electric plants may charge for production of certain maps as a public record. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52.
Title
As introduced, adds costs of certain printing equipment to current list of costs for which municipal electric plants may charge for production of certain maps as a public record. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Barnes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Govt Com. | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0473 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-10 - P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0438&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0438.pdf |