TN SB0435 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from 30 to 35 days the time within which request for judicial review of an order revoking the license of a dental service plan corporation must be made. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, changes from 30 to 35 days the time within which request for judicial review of an order revoking the license of a dental service plan corporation must be made. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0264 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-01 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Insurance and Banking Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0435&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0435.pdf |