TN SB0432 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes operators of crematory facilities who provide free services for the cremation of human remains to receive a refund of the permit fee paid for such services. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, authorizes operators of crematory facilities who provide free services for the cremation of human remains to receive a refund of the permit fee paid for such services. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 375 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0967 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 375