TN SB0432 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means to first calendar of 2018
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means to first calendar of 2018
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates Class C felony offense of possessing a telecommunication device in a place where prisoners are housed if the device is used to facilitate coercing a juror or witness, escape, or a felony drug offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 39, Chapter 15 and Title 39, Chapter 16.
Title
As introduced, creates Class C felony offense of possessing a telecommunication device in a place where prisoners are housed if the device is used to facilitate coercing a juror or witness, escape, or a felony drug offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 39, Chapter 15 and Title 39, Chapter 16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means to first calendar of 2018 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1286 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee