TN SB0429 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-24 - H. tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-24 - H. tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expresses legislative intent that the persons appointed to a charter commission for the consolidation of the functions of the county and creation of a metropolitan government be representative of both incorporated and unincorporated areas of the county. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9 and Title 67, relative to local governments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY MILLER AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY MILLER AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY MILLER AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY MILLER AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY MILLER AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY MILLER AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | H. tabled. |
2024-04-16 | House | Failed to adopt, (Amendment 5 - HA0913) Ayes 25, Nays 68, PNV 0 |
2024-04-16 | House | Failed to adopt, (Amendment 4 - HA0912) Ayes 25, Nays 69, PNV 0 |
2024-04-16 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA0911) |
2024-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0684) |
2024-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0585) |
2024-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 6 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0343) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/6/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0474 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.