TN SB0427 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that any state community colleges that are within the service area of Roane State Community College, located in Campbell County, and located within five miles of Interstate 75 be signed. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 54, Chapter 5, relative to directional signs for public community colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/13/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 438 | |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0404) |
2021-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0112) |
2021-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0191) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recalled from S. Finance, Ways & Means Comm. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0540 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 438