TN SB0426 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Passed on Second Consideration. Held on Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the Tennessee bureau of investigation, by January 1, 2024, to submit a report to the general assembly that, at a minimum, provides the total number of convictions, since January 1, 2021, of persons who possessed a used, detached catalytic converter that the persons did not have authorization to possess; provides recommendations for legislation to improve upon enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, relative to catalytic converters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-26SenatePassed on Second Consideration. Held on Desk.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0333 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-30 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback