TN SB0423 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 509
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 509
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, eliminates the special privilege tax on ammunition. - Amends TCA Section 8-8-201 and Title 70, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, eliminates the special privilege tax on ammunition. - Amends TCA Section 8-8-201 and Title 70, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 509 | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/1/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee with negative recommendation |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0494 (Crossfiled) 2019-06-06 - Pub. Ch. 509